THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:22:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PCC Pain Care Clinics
6981 Millcreek Drive
Unit 2
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Fax: (289) 914-2273
Address: PCC Pain care clinics
Unit 100
701 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A2
Phone: 2897687246
Fax: 2897792273
Address: 33 broadway ave
unit 1
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadir Al-Jazrawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Al-Jazrawi (CPSO#: 79997 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PCC Pain Care Clinics
6981 Millcreek Drive
Unit 2
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Fax: (289) 914-2273
Address: PCC Pain care clinics
Unit 100
701 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A2
Phone: 2897687246
Fax: 2897792273
Address: 33 broadway ave
unit 1
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadir Al-Jazrawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Al-Jazrawi (CPSO#: 79997 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIR HIKMAT ELIA AL-JAZRAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-JAZRAWI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIR HIKMAT ELIA AL-JAZRAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-JAZRAWI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2003