THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:19:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1650 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 644-1112
Fax: (416) 479-0011
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Ave, 8th floor
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4621
Fax: (416) 586-5941

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Feb 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 03 Jun 2013

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Pearlman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pearlman (CPSO#: 80007 )
Business Address: 101 - 1650 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 2A2
(416) 644-1112

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1650 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 644-1112
Fax: (416) 479-0011
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Ave, 8th floor
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4621
Fax: (416) 586-5941

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Feb 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 03 Jun 2013

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Pearlman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pearlman (CPSO#: 80007 )
Business Address: 101 - 1650 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 2A2
(416) 644-1112

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER BETH PEARLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARLMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER BETH PEARLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARLMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2003