THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:18:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 HADWEN ROAD
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 855-1860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-50 Minthorn Blvd
KMH Cardiology Centres Inc
Thornhill ON L3T 7X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Minthorn Blvd
Suite 101
Thornhill ON L3T 7X8
Phone: 905-855-1860
Fax: 905-855-1863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahadevan Rajaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rajaram (CPSO#: 80008 )
Business Address: 2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
(905) 855-1860
Business Address: 106-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(877) 564-5227

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 HADWEN ROAD
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 855-1860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-50 Minthorn Blvd
KMH Cardiology Centres Inc
Thornhill ON L3T 7X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Minthorn Blvd
Suite 101
Thornhill ON L3T 7X8
Phone: 905-855-1860
Fax: 905-855-1863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahadevan Rajaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rajaram (CPSO#: 80008 )
Business Address: 2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L3
(905) 855-1860
Business Address: 106-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(877) 564-5227

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHADEVAN RAJARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJARAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHADEVAN RAJARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJARAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2003