THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:06:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Synergy Centre
Family Dental and Healthcare Centre
1635 Hyde Park Road
London Ontario N6H 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 266-3600
Fax: (888) 758-3601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Tetelbaum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tetelbaum (CPSO#: 80018 )
Business Address: Synergy Centre
Family Dental and Healthcare Centre
1635 Hyde Park Road
London Ontario N6H 5L7
(519) 266-3600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Synergy Centre
Family Dental and Healthcare Centre
1635 Hyde Park Road
London Ontario N6H 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 266-3600
Fax: (888) 758-3601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Tetelbaum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tetelbaum (CPSO#: 80018 )
Business Address: Synergy Centre
Family Dental and Healthcare Centre
1635 Hyde Park Road
London Ontario N6H 5L7
(519) 266-3600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA TETELBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TETELBAUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA TETELBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TETELBAUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 May 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2003