THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:23:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ife, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3, 196 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 697-8300
Fax: (905) 697-8264
Address: 10 John Birchall Rd
UNIT 3
Richmond Hill ON L4S 0B2
Phone: 9057707143
Fax: 9057375579
Address: 6-2687 Kipling Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G6
Phone: 4167499020
Fax: 4167499018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omiwole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Omiwole (CPSO#: 80027 )
Business Address: 3 - 196 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P1
(905) 697-8300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Ife, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3, 196 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 697-8300
Fax: (905) 697-8264
Address: 10 John Birchall Rd
UNIT 3
Richmond Hill ON L4S 0B2
Phone: 9057707143
Fax: 9057375579
Address: 6-2687 Kipling Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G6
Phone: 4167499020
Fax: 4167499018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omiwole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Omiwole (CPSO#: 80027 )
Business Address: 3 - 196 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P1
(905) 697-8300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUFEMI OLANIYI OMIWOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMIWOLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUFEMI OLANIYI OMIWOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMIWOLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Feb 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Feb 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Ife, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 18 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2003