THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:35:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 Gainsborough Rd
Thompson Medical Clinic
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-601-8621
Fax: 519-2043122
Address: 260 Nebo Road
CanMed
Endoscopy
Unit 200 second floor
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
Phone: 1-226-443-6608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
Phone: 15199545900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Wellington Road South
London Ontario N6C 4P4
Phone: (519) 433-4700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3580 Thomas Street
CanMed Endoscopy Mississauga
Endoscopy
Unit 103
Mississauga Ontario L5M 0G2
Phone: (226) 368-3490
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Alqutub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alqutub (CPSO#: 80065 )
Business Address: Upper-1041 Gainsborough Rd
990 Gainsborough Rd
N6H 5L4
London ON N6H 5L4
519-601-8621
Business Address: 130 Thompson Road
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
(519) 204-2790
Business Address: 310 Wellington Road South
London Ontario N6C 4P4
(519) 433-4700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 Gainsborough Rd
Thompson Medical Clinic
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-601-8621
Fax: 519-2043122
Address: 260 Nebo Road
CanMed
Endoscopy
Unit 200 second floor
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
Phone: 1-226-443-6608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
Phone: 15199545900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Wellington Road South
London Ontario N6C 4P4
Phone: (519) 433-4700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3580 Thomas Street
CanMed Endoscopy Mississauga
Endoscopy
Unit 103
Mississauga Ontario L5M 0G2
Phone: (226) 368-3490
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Alqutub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alqutub (CPSO#: 80065 )
Business Address: Upper-1041 Gainsborough Rd
990 Gainsborough Rd
N6H 5L4
London ON N6H 5L4
519-601-8621
Business Address: 130 Thompson Road
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
(519) 204-2790
Business Address: 310 Wellington Road South
London Ontario N6C 4P4
(519) 433-4700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL NAZMI HASAN ALQUTUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALQUTUB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL NAZMI HASAN ALQUTUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALQUTUB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2003