THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:07:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ankara, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, IRANIAN, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Radiology
1245 Lakeshore road
L7S 0A2
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Radiology
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 17 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Midia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Midia (CPSO#: 80090 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
D1
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3730
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Diagnostic Imaging
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, IRANIAN, TURKISH
Medical School: University of Ankara, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Radiology
1245 Lakeshore road
L7S 0A2
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Radiology
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 17 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Midia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Midia (CPSO#: 80090 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
D1
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3730
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Diagnostic Imaging
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6300

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Jun 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 20 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mehran Midia may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mehran Midia may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ankara, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 May 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2003