THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:30:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mavis Wellness
5025 Heatherleigh Avenue
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 501-9115
Fax: (905) 501-9114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: abu setteh medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abu Setteh (CPSO#: 80109 )
Business Address: 1-5025 Heatherleigh Ave
Mississauga ON L5V 2Y7
9055019115

Corporation Name: Abu Setteh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mavis Wellness
5025 Heatherleigh Avenue
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 501-9115
Fax: (905) 501-9114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: abu setteh medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abu Setteh (CPSO#: 80109 )
Business Address: 1-5025 Heatherleigh Ave
Mississauga ON L5V 2Y7
9055019115

Corporation Name: Abu Setteh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIHAD MOOSA ABDULLA ABU SETTEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU SETTEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIHAD MOOSA ABDULLA ABU SETTEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU SETTEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2003