THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:01:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatric Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 28 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Nasr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nasr (CPSO#: 80110 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatric Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatric Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 28 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Nasr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nasr (CPSO#: 80110 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatric Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED LOFTY NASR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED LOFTY NASR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2003