THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:31:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
460
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-277-7077
Fax: 289-667-0606

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariam Zakhary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zakhary (CPSO#: 80119 )
Business Address: 460-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
289-277-7077

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
460
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-277-7077
Fax: 289-667-0606

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariam Zakhary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zakhary (CPSO#: 80119 )
Business Address: 460-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
289-277-7077

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAM RIZK ZAKHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKHARY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAM RIZK ZAKHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKHARY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2003