THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ife, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northgate Medical Centre
980 Central Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 458-4771
Fax: (905) 458-5376
Address: 2580 JARVIS STREET
Mississauga Ontario L5C 2P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Felix Asekomhe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Asekomhe (CPSO#: 80123 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ife, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northgate Medical Centre
980 Central Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 458-4771
Fax: (905) 458-5376
Address: 2580 JARVIS STREET
Mississauga Ontario L5C 2P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Felix Asekomhe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Asekomhe (CPSO#: 80123 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IKHIMHIAGIE FELIX ASEKOMHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASEKOMHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IKHIMHIAGIE FELIX ASEKOMHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASEKOMHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Apr 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Apr 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: University of Ife, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2003
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2003