THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:28:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103A
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 979-4000
Fax: (519) 979-5777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Radin (CPSO#: 80163 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103A
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 979-4000
Fax: (519) 979-5777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Radin (CPSO#: 80163 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL AUREL RADIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL AUREL RADIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2003