THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:52:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 595 Bradley Avenue
SUITE: 204
London Ontario N6E 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-203-5841
Fax: 519-203-5844
Address: Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 485-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Outpatient Wound Clinic
550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Phone: 519-685-4027
Extension: 3
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Punkuj Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chawla (CPSO#: 80207 )
Business Address: 204-595 Bradley Avenue
London Ontario N6E 3Z8
Business Address: 29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
(519) 485-1700
Business Address: 550 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6C 0A7
(519) 646-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 595 Bradley Avenue
SUITE: 204
London Ontario N6E 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-203-5841
Fax: 519-203-5844
Address: Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 485-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Outpatient Wound Clinic
550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Phone: 519-685-4027
Extension: 3
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Punkuj Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chawla (CPSO#: 80207 )
Business Address: 204-595 Bradley Avenue
London Ontario N6E 3Z8
Business Address: 29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
(519) 485-1700
Business Address: 550 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6C 0A7
(519) 646-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNKUJ CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNKUJ CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2003