THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:14:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greenbelt FHT
3500 Fallowfield Rd.
Unit 1C
Nepean Ontario K2J 4A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 843 1718
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 211 Lake Ave. E.
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: (613) 257-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Sep 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zhao (CPSO#: 80209 )
Business Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
(613) 257-2200
Business Address: Greenbelt FHT
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean Ontario K2J 4A7
(613) 843-1718

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greenbelt FHT
3500 Fallowfield Rd.
Unit 1C
Nepean Ontario K2J 4A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 843 1718
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 211 Lake Ave. E.
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: (613) 257-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Sep 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zhao (CPSO#: 80209 )
Business Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
(613) 257-2200
Business Address: Greenbelt FHT
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean Ontario K2J 4A7
(613) 843-1718

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2003
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2003