THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:10:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 St Paul Ave
Suite 205B
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nawaz Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Arora (CPSO#: 80218 )
Business Address: 353 St Paul Avenue
Suite 205B
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
519 309 0066

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 St Paul Ave
Suite 205B
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nawaz Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Arora (CPSO#: 80218 )
Business Address: 353 St Paul Avenue
Suite 205B
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
519 309 0066

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAWAZ SUNEET ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAWAZ SUNEET ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2003