THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 331
125 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-6405
Fax: (519) 822-7591
Address: 485 Silvercreek Pkwy
Guelph Ontario N1H 7K5
Phone: 519 821 2060
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 485 Silvercreek Parkway North
737 Woolwich Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 7K5
Phone: 1-844-264-2993
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nahid Shethwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shethwala (CPSO#: 80221 )
Business Address: 331- 125 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J5
(519) 822-6405
Business Address: 1-485 Silvercreek Parkway North
Guelph Ontario N1H 7K5
(519) 323-3771
Business Address: 737 Woolwich Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 3Z2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 331
125 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-6405
Fax: (519) 822-7591
Address: 485 Silvercreek Pkwy
Guelph Ontario N1H 7K5
Phone: 519 821 2060
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 485 Silvercreek Parkway North
737 Woolwich Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 7K5
Phone: 1-844-264-2993
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nahid Shethwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shethwala (CPSO#: 80221 )
Business Address: 331- 125 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J5
(519) 822-6405
Business Address: 1-485 Silvercreek Parkway North
Guelph Ontario N1H 7K5
(519) 323-3771
Business Address: 737 Woolwich Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 3Z2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAHID KHALID SHETHWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETHWALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAHID KHALID SHETHWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETHWALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2003