THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 117
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-2553
Fax: (519) 252-2857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rahman (CPSO#: 80229 )
Business Address: 117 - 700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4T2
(519) 258-2553
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 117
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-2553
Fax: (519) 252-2857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rahman (CPSO#: 80229 )
Business Address: 117 - 700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4T2
(519) 258-2553
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIFFAT UR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIFFAT UR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 May 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 May 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2003