THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:58:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Natal, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Fax: (905) 697-3645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Riaz Moolla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moolla (CPSO#: 80235 )
Business Address: Suite 2101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-3607

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Natal, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Fax: (905) 697-3645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Riaz Moolla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moolla (CPSO#: 80235 )
Business Address: Suite 2101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-3607

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIAZ MOOLLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOLLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIAZ MOOLLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOLLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Natal, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2003