THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-139 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2N 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-7546
Fax: 416-221-7546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Niakosari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Niakosari (CPSO#: 80238 )
Business Address: 139 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 3
Toronto Ontario M2N 3A6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-139 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2N 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-7546
Fax: 416-221-7546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Niakosari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Niakosari (CPSO#: 80238 )
Business Address: 139 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 3
Toronto Ontario M2N 3A6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIROUZEH NIAKOSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIAKOSARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIROUZEH NIAKOSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIAKOSARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Dec 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Dec 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2003