THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:07:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, MALAYALAM, TAMIL, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 4
200 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-8525
Fax: (905) 853-8530
Address: UNIT 1D
6884, 14 TH AVENUE
Markham Ontario L6B 1A8
Phone: (905) 554-1517
Fax: (905) 554-2760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shakkeela Padanilathu Kunjummar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Padanilathu Kunjummar (CPSO#: 80243 )
Business Address: Suite 1D
6884 14th Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1A8
(905) 554-1517
Business Address: Unit 4
200 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2N4
(905) 853-8525

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, MALAYALAM, TAMIL, URDU
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 4
200 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-8525
Fax: (905) 853-8530
Address: UNIT 1D
6884, 14 TH AVENUE
Markham Ontario L6B 1A8
Phone: (905) 554-1517
Fax: (905) 554-2760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shakkeela Padanilathu Kunjummar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Padanilathu Kunjummar (CPSO#: 80243 )
Business Address: Suite 1D
6884 14th Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1A8
(905) 554-1517
Business Address: Unit 4
200 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2N4
(905) 853-8525

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAKKEELA PADANILATHU KUNJUMMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADANILATHU KUNJUMMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAKKEELA PADANILATHU KUNJUMMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADANILATHU KUNJUMMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Apr 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2003