THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:42:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univerzita Komenskeho,Martin, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193714373
Fax: 5193715738
Address: 15955 Airport Road
apt 103
Caledon East Ontario L7C 1H9
Phone: 13657220164
Fax: 1365722165

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wael N El Abbasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. El Abbassi (CPSO#: 80244 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Suite 5109
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(647) 885-5806

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univerzita Komenskeho,Martin, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193714373
Fax: 5193715738
Address: 15955 Airport Road
apt 103
Caledon East Ontario L7C 1H9
Phone: 13657220164
Fax: 1365722165

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wael N El Abbasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. El Abbassi (CPSO#: 80244 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Suite 5109
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(647) 885-5806

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Nov 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 27 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. WAEL NABIL EL ABBASSI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. WAEL NABIL EL ABBASSI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univerzita Komenskeho,Martin, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2003