THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wonderland Medicentre
1375 Beaverbrook Ave
London Ontario N6H 0J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 471-6686
Fax: (519) 471-2801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Said Ramadan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramadan (CPSO#: 80246 )
Business Address: 1375 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 0J1
(519) 471-6686

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wonderland Medicentre
1375 Beaverbrook Ave
London Ontario N6H 0J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 471-6686
Fax: (519) 471-2801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Said Ramadan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramadan (CPSO#: 80246 )
Business Address: 1375 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 0J1
(519) 471-6686

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAID ABDEL RAHMAN SAID RAMADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMADAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAID ABDEL RAHMAN SAID RAMADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMADAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Apr 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2003