THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:14:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aligarh Muslim University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2285 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-253-6112
Fax: 519-253-6335
Address: VCare Paediatric Walk iin Clinic
Suite 2.
2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V2
Phone: 5192547979
Fax: 519 2540488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Huma Kazmie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kazmie (CPSO#: 80336 )
Business Address: 1 - 2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V2
(519) 253-6112

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Aligarh Muslim University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2285 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-253-6112
Fax: 519-253-6335
Address: VCare Paediatric Walk iin Clinic
Suite 2.
2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V2
Phone: 5192547979
Fax: 519 2540488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Huma Kazmie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kazmie (CPSO#: 80336 )
Business Address: 1 - 2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V2
(519) 253-6112

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMA KAZMIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZMIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMA KAZMIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZMIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aligarh Muslim University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2003