THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Natal, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fourth Avenue Medical Clinic
411 Louth Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-3692
Fax: (905) 682-7549

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naushad Hoosen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hoosen (CPSO#: 80356 )
Business Address: Fourth Avenue Medical Clinic
411 Louth Street
St Catharines Ontario L2S 4A2
(905) 682-3692

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Natal, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fourth Avenue Medical Clinic
411 Louth Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-3692
Fax: (905) 682-7549

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naushad Hoosen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hoosen (CPSO#: 80356 )
Business Address: Fourth Avenue Medical Clinic
411 Louth Street
St Catharines Ontario L2S 4A2
(905) 682-3692

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAUSHAD HOOSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAUSHAD HOOSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Natal, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2003