THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Skyward Family Practice
Unit 104
2255 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 608-2111
Fax: (905) 608-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 80369 )
Business Address: 2255 Dundas Street West
Unit 104
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1R6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Skyward Family Practice
Unit 104
2255 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 608-2111
Fax: (905) 608-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 80369 )
Business Address: 2255 Dundas Street West
Unit 104
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1R6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UZMA SIDDIQ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UZMA SIDDIQ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Jan 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2003