THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1800 Stn Main
381 Church Street
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Church St
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McNicoll Avenue
1020
Toronto Ontario
Phone: 6476700435
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atul Bansal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bansal (CPSO#: 80374 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: 650 Church St
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
4169252251

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1800 Stn Main
381 Church Street
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Church St
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McNicoll Avenue
1020
Toronto Ontario
Phone: 6476700435
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atul Bansal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bansal (CPSO#: 80374 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: 650 Church St
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
4169252251

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATUL BANSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANSAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATUL BANSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANSAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2004