THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:45:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Corporation
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stuoffville Hospital
381 Church St,
PO BOX1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Corporation
Oshawa General Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samy Mikhail Saad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saad (CPSO#: 80383 )
Business Address: Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Corporation
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7570

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Corporation
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stuoffville Hospital
381 Church St,
PO BOX1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Corporation
Oshawa General Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samy Mikhail Saad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saad (CPSO#: 80383 )
Business Address: Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Corporation
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7570

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMY MIKHAIL SOLIMAN SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMY MIKHAIL SOLIMAN SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2004