THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:15:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Sherbourne Street
Suit No 308
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 748-7414
Fax: (647) 748-7424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Azzahrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Azzahrani (CPSO#: 80428 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Sherbourne Street
Suit No 308
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 748-7414
Fax: (647) 748-7424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Azzahrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Azzahrani (CPSO#: 80428 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED SAEED MISFER AZZAHRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZAHRANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED SAEED MISFER AZZAHRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZAHRANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2004