THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 22:51:06 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
210-600 University Avenue
Toronto, ON
M5G 1X5
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 2014
Fax: 416-586-8358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael A. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McDonald (CPSO#: 80565 ) Dr. J. Johnstone (CPSO#: 80436 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
11th Floor Room 11-PMB-131
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
210-600 University Avenue
Toronto, ON
M5G 1X5
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 2014
Fax: 416-586-8358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael A. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McDonald (CPSO#: 80565 ) Dr. J. Johnstone (CPSO#: 80436 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
11th Floor Room 11-PMB-131
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIE JOHNSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIE JOHNSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2004