THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ibrahim, Tharwat Ramzy Saleh (Used Until: 28 Apr 2004)
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr Langer Family Medicine and Walk
IN Clinic
9455 Mississauga Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 502 0605
Fax: (905) 502 0608
Address: 49 Sterne
King Nursing Home
Bolton Ontario L7E 1B9
Phone: (905) 857-4117
Fax: (905) 357-5181
Address: Leisureworld Nursing Home
Brampton Wood
9257 Goreway Drive
Brampton Ontario L6P 0N5
Phone: (905) 799-7502
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Leisureworld Nursing Home
215 Sunny Meadows Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B5
Phone: (905) 458-7604
Fax: (905) 456-9255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarwat Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 80488 )
Business Address: Dr Langer Family and Walk In Clinic
9455 Mississauga Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 0B3
(905) 502-0605

General Information

Former Name: Ibrahim, Tharwat Ramzy Saleh (Used Until: 28 Apr 2004)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr Langer Family Medicine and Walk
IN Clinic
9455 Mississauga Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 502 0605
Fax: (905) 502 0608
Address: 49 Sterne
King Nursing Home
Bolton Ontario L7E 1B9
Phone: (905) 857-4117
Fax: (905) 357-5181
Address: Leisureworld Nursing Home
Brampton Wood
9257 Goreway Drive
Brampton Ontario L6P 0N5
Phone: (905) 799-7502
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Leisureworld Nursing Home
215 Sunny Meadows Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B5
Phone: (905) 458-7604
Fax: (905) 456-9255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarwat Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 80488 )
Business Address: Dr Langer Family and Walk In Clinic
9455 Mississauga Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 0B3
(905) 502-0605

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARWAT IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARWAT IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2004