THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:11:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Terry Fox Medical
Unit 10
5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga Ontario L5V 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 858-3030
Fax: (905) 858-3031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Y. Beshay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Beshay (CPSO#: 80491 )
Business Address: Terry Fox Medical
Unit 10
5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga Ontario L5V 0A5
(905) 858-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Terry Fox Medical
Unit 10
5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga Ontario L5V 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 858-3030
Fax: (905) 858-3031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Y. Beshay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Beshay (CPSO#: 80491 )
Business Address: Terry Fox Medical
Unit 10
5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga Ontario L5V 0A5
(905) 858-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANY YOUSSEF TAWFEEK BESHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANY YOUSSEF TAWFEEK BESHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 14 Jul 2009
Summary of Decision:
On July 14, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Beshay committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Beshay received his medical degree in Egypt in 1986, and thereafter practised medicine in Egypt until 1996, at which time he moved to Ontario. Between November 1996 and June 2001, Dr. Beshay did not practise medicine, except for one period in 1998 when he maintains he practised in Egypt. In 2001, Dr. Beshay obtained a licence to practise medicine in the Yukon. In 2004, Dr. Beshay was granted a certificate of registration from the CPSO. Dr. Beshay admitted that the information he supplied to the CPSO and the Yukon Medical Council was in error, in that it failed to disclose interruptions in practice after he came to Canada in 1996.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Beshay appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

2. Dr. Beshay pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.

3. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 14, 2009

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 14 Jul 2009
Summary of Decision:
On July 14, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Beshay committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Beshay received his medical degree in Egypt in 1986, and thereafter practised medicine in Egypt until 1996, at which time he moved to Ontario. Between November 1996 and June 2001, Dr. Beshay did not practise medicine, except for one period in 1998 when he maintains he practised in Egypt. In 2001, Dr. Beshay obtained a licence to practise medicine in the Yukon. In 2004, Dr. Beshay was granted a certificate of registration from the CPSO. Dr. Beshay admitted that the information he supplied to the CPSO and the Yukon Medical Council was in error, in that it failed to disclose interruptions in practice after he came to Canada in 1996.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Beshay appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

2. Dr. Beshay pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.

3. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 14, 2009

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2004