THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:34:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7723
Fax: (416) 323-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Udell and Kuriya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kuriya (CPSO#: 79433 ) Dr. J. Udell (CPSO#: 80505 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7723
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
2nd Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 2217
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7723
Fax: (416) 323-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Udell and Kuriya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kuriya (CPSO#: 79433 ) Dr. J. Udell (CPSO#: 80505 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7723
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
2nd Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 2217
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB ALLAN UDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB ALLAN UDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2004