THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 02:57:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-2048
Fax: (613) 623-6719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Kurian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kurian (CPSO#: 80515 )
Business Address: Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-2048

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-2048
Fax: (613) 623-6719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Kurian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kurian (CPSO#: 80515 )
Business Address: Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-2048

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN SAINA KURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN SAINA KURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 May 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 May 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2004