THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:33:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, KANNADA, TAMIL, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1340 El Paseo Court
Greely Ontario K4P 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 618-0601
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2430 Bank Street unit 5
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0T7
Phone: (613) 736-6946
Extension: 4
Fax: (613) 736-6948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anees Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan (CPSO#: 80559 )
Business Address: Unit 3
2430 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0T7
(613) 736-6947 Extn: 4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, KANNADA, TAMIL, URDU
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1340 El Paseo Court
Greely Ontario K4P 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 618-0601
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2430 Bank Street unit 5
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0T7
Phone: (613) 736-6946
Extension: 4
Fax: (613) 736-6948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anees Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan (CPSO#: 80559 )
Business Address: Unit 3
2430 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0T7
(613) 736-6947 Extn: 4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANEES AYUB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANEES AYUB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bangalore University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2004