THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:03:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Room C4 211
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 32904
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anton I. Skaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Skaro (CPSO#: 80574 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Room C4 211
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 32904
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anton I. Skaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Skaro (CPSO#: 80574 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTON IVAN SKARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKARO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTON IVAN SKARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKARO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2004