THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:57:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus Site
Division of Neurology
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3464
Fax: (519) 663-3498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 03 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Peru

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burneo de las Casas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Burneo de las Casas (CPSO#: 80599 )
Business Address: Division of Neurology
LHSC - University Campus
Suite B10 - 120
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3464

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus Site
Division of Neurology
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3464
Fax: (519) 663-3498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 03 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Peru

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burneo de las Casas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Burneo de las Casas (CPSO#: 80599 )
Business Address: Division of Neurology
LHSC - University Campus
Suite B10 - 120
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3464

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Mar 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 09 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jorge Guillermo Burneo de las Casas may practise medicine
independently in Neurology,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jorge Guillermo Burneo de las Casas may practise medicine
independently in Neurology,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Feb 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2004