THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-225 Preston St
Ottawa ON K1R 7R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134820118
Fax: No Information Available
Address: iCare Surgical & Optical Centre
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H1
Phone: 613 596 0300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Fahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fahim (CPSO#: 80606 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Group
2116 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 6M7
Business Address: 225 Preston St
Ottawa ON K1R 7R1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-225 Preston St
Ottawa ON K1R 7R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134820118
Fax: No Information Available
Address: iCare Surgical & Optical Centre
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H1
Phone: 613 596 0300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Fahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fahim (CPSO#: 80606 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Group
2116 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 6M7
Business Address: 225 Preston St
Ottawa ON K1R 7R1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
08 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 08 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon


As from July 28, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Raouf Michel Fahim,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fahim to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. RAOUF MICHEL FAHIM
("Dr. Fahim")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

(2) I, Dr. Fahim, certificate of registration number 80606, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my practice.

(3) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
bearing File Number 100364 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct in my family practice.

(4) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that, in addition to the present Undertaking,
the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Fahim, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
from the date on which I sign it.

(6) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a
sign in the waiting room(s) and in any examination room of all my
Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
the form set out at Appendix "A". For further clarity, this sign
shall state as follows: "Dr. Fahim is a Family Physician practicing
in Ophthalmology and was qualified in Ophthalmology in the UK. Dr.
Fahim MD, MS, FRCS(UK), CCFP. Further information may be found on
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca".

(b) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
section (6)(a) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations,
in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
Appendix "A."

(c) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to provide to the College the certified
translation(s) described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to
provide services in the language(s) described in section (6)(d).


(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in Ontario
(collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days
of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake
to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to comply with the provisions of this Undertaking
and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking
may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and
may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
Committee.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

(13) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Fahim shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms
and the examination rooms of all his Practice Locations, which
states as follows: "Dr. Fahim is a Family Physician practicing in
Ophthalmology and was qualified in Ophthalmology in the UK. Dr.
Fahim MD, MS, FRCS(UK), CCFP. Further information may be found on
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca".

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Fahim, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.





VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon


As from July 28, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Raouf Michel Fahim,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fahim to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. RAOUF MICHEL FAHIM
("Dr. Fahim")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

(2) I, Dr. Fahim, certificate of registration number 80606, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my practice.

(3) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
bearing File Number 100364 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct in my family practice.

(4) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that, in addition to the present Undertaking,
the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Fahim, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
from the date on which I sign it.

(6) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a
sign in the waiting room(s) and in any examination room of all my
Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
the form set out at Appendix "A". For further clarity, this sign
shall state as follows: "Dr. Fahim is a Family Physician practicing
in Ophthalmology and was qualified in Ophthalmology in the UK. Dr.
Fahim MD, MS, FRCS(UK), CCFP. Further information may be found on
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca".

(b) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
section (6)(a) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations,
in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
Appendix "A."

(c) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to provide to the College the certified
translation(s) described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to
provide services in the language(s) described in section (6)(d).


(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in Ontario
(collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days
of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake
to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to comply with the provisions of this Undertaking
and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking
may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and
may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
Committee.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

(13) I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Fahim shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms
and the examination rooms of all his Practice Locations, which
states as follows: "Dr. Fahim is a Family Physician practicing in
Ophthalmology and was qualified in Ophthalmology in the UK. Dr.
Fahim MD, MS, FRCS(UK), CCFP. Further information may be found on
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca".

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Fahim, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.





Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Jul 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Raouf Michel Fahim to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 28, 2016:

Dr. Fahim shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and the examination rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Fahim is a Family Physician practicing in Ophthalmology and was qualified in Ophthalmology in the UK. Dr. Fahim MD, MS, FRCS(UK), CCFP. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Jul 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Raouf Michel Fahim to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 28, 2016:

Dr. Fahim shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and the examination rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Fahim is a Family Physician practicing in Ophthalmology and was qualified in Ophthalmology in the UK. Dr. Fahim MD, MS, FRCS(UK), CCFP. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 08 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 29 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 May 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 May 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2004