THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:55:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN MSH Fred A Litwin Family Centre
in Genetic Medicine
3rd Floor Room 400 Box 34
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4220
Fax: (416) 619-5523

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantal Morel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morel (CPSO#: 80624 )
Business Address: UHN MSH Fred A Litwin Family Center
in Genetic Medicine
3rd Floor Room 400 Box 34
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4224

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN MSH Fred A Litwin Family Centre
in Genetic Medicine
3rd Floor Room 400 Box 34
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4220
Fax: (416) 619-5523

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantal Morel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morel (CPSO#: 80624 )
Business Address: UHN MSH Fred A Litwin Family Center
in Genetic Medicine
3rd Floor Room 400 Box 34
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4224

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTAL FRANCE JOELLE MOREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTAL FRANCE JOELLE MOREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 May 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 May 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2004