THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:36:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 King St E
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
Phone: 1(905)7214928
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 207 Dundas Street West
office
unit 100
Whitby Ontario L1N 2M4
Phone: 9054308031
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 27 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kousa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kousa (CPSO#: 80629 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Durham Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 3720

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 King St E
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
Phone: 1(905)7214928
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 207 Dundas Street West
office
unit 100
Whitby Ontario L1N 2M4
Phone: 9054308031
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 27 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kousa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kousa (CPSO#: 80629 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Durham Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 3720

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAMAL MUSA KOUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAMAL MUSA KOUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Nov 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2004