THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:28:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 770 Somerset Street West
suite 104
Ottawa Ontario K1R 0E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132300008
Fax: 613-230-8884
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Fax: (416) 512-6375
Address: Unit 9-4646 Dufferin Street
Silver Pain Centre
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4
Phone: 4165126407
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 12 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al Fasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alfasi (CPSO#: 80636 )
Business Address: CPM Centres for Pain Management
100 - 1770 Woodward Dr
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
(613) 755-2095

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 770 Somerset Street West
suite 104
Ottawa Ontario K1R 0E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132300008
Fax: 613-230-8884
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Fax: (416) 512-6375
Address: Unit 9-4646 Dufferin Street
Silver Pain Centre
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4
Phone: 4165126407
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 12 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al Fasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alfasi (CPSO#: 80636 )
Business Address: CPM Centres for Pain Management
100 - 1770 Woodward Dr
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
(613) 755-2095

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULGHADER MOHAMED ABDULGHADER ALFASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFASI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULGHADER MOHAMED ABDULGHADER ALFASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFASI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2004