THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:40:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: Wohlgemut, Matthew Angus (Used Until: 07 Aug 2005)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Canboro Street
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 957-3328
Fax: (905) 957-2475

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Noble Wohlgemut Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Noble Wohlgemut (CPSO#: 80641 )
Business Address: 230 Canboro Street
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
(905) 957-3328

General Information

Former Name: Wohlgemut, Matthew Angus (Used Until: 07 Aug 2005)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Canboro Street
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 957-3328
Fax: (905) 957-2475

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Noble Wohlgemut Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Noble Wohlgemut (CPSO#: 80641 )
Business Address: 230 Canboro Street
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
(905) 957-3328

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANGUS NOBLE WOHLGEMUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE WOHLGEMUT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANGUS NOBLE WOHLGEMUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE WOHLGEMUT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 May 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 May 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2004