THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room C2218
Division of Neurosurgery
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10661
Fax: (613) 761-4833
Address: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
The Ottawa Hospital, Cancer centre
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137985555
Extension: 10661
Fax: 613 7614833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 20 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fahad Alkherayf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Alkherayf (CPSO#: 80643 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital-Civic Campus
Division of Neurosurgery
Room C2218
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 10661
Business Address: 27 Marchvale Drive
Kanata Ontario K2W 1C1
6137971239

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room C2218
Division of Neurosurgery
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10661
Fax: (613) 761-4833
Address: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
The Ottawa Hospital, Cancer centre
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137985555
Extension: 10661
Fax: 613 7614833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 20 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fahad Alkherayf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Alkherayf (CPSO#: 80643 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital-Civic Campus
Division of Neurosurgery
Room C2218
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 10661
Business Address: 27 Marchvale Drive
Kanata Ontario K2W 1C1
6137971239

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAHAD ABDULMOHSEN E ALKHERAYF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHERAYF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAHAD ABDULMOHSEN E ALKHERAYF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHERAYF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2004