THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:46:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 850-0004
Fax: (905) 850-0006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 26 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca L. Cash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cash (CPSO#: 80666 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
(905) 850-0004

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 850-0004
Fax: (905) 850-0006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 26 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca L. Cash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cash (CPSO#: 80666 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
(905) 850-0004

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA LEE CASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA LEE CASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004