THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:12:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
HSC - 3H1A
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76401
Fax: (905) 578-8800
Address: Suite 36 - 1960 Appleby Line
Burlington, ON
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Phone: (905)332-9292
Fax: (905)578-8800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matsos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matsos (CPSO#: 80672 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
HSC-3H1A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76401

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
HSC - 3H1A
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76401
Fax: (905) 578-8800
Address: Suite 36 - 1960 Appleby Line
Burlington, ON
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Phone: (905)332-9292
Fax: (905)578-8800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matsos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matsos (CPSO#: 80672 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
HSC-3H1A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76401

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK PAUL MATSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATSOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK PAUL MATSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATSOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004