THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:53:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1 102
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 76538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ouellette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ouellette (CPSO#: 80675 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 76538
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 76538
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 76538

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1 102
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 76538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ouellette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ouellette (CPSO#: 80675 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 76538
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 76538
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 76538

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM OUELLETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLETTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM OUELLETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLETTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004