THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto West Medical
523 The Queensway, Suite One
Toronto Ontario M8Y 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 760-8367
Fax: (416) 760-7212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Clement Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clement (CPSO#: 80681 )
Business Address: Suite 1
523 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M8Y 1J7
(416) 760-8367

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto West Medical
523 The Queensway, Suite One
Toronto Ontario M8Y 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 760-8367
Fax: (416) 760-7212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Clement Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clement (CPSO#: 80681 )
Business Address: Suite 1
523 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M8Y 1J7
(416) 760-8367

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELIZABETH JANE CLEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELIZABETH JANE CLEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004