THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2125 Front Road
LaSalle Ontario N9J 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 734-1234
Fax: (519) 734-8674
Address: 11550 McNorton Street
Heron Terrace
Windsor Ontario N8P 1T9
Phone: (519) 979-6730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leslie C. Morvay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Morvay (CPSO#: 80700 )
Business Address: 2125 Front Road
La Salle Ontario N9J 2C1
(519) 734-1234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2125 Front Road
LaSalle Ontario N9J 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 734-1234
Fax: (519) 734-8674
Address: 11550 McNorton Street
Heron Terrace
Windsor Ontario N8P 1T9
Phone: (519) 979-6730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leslie C. Morvay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Morvay (CPSO#: 80700 )
Business Address: 2125 Front Road
La Salle Ontario N9J 2C1
(519) 734-1234

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE CHRISTOPHER MORVAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORVAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE CHRISTOPHER MORVAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORVAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004