THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:42:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Healthcare
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10260 Kennedy Rd
Woodhall Park Care Community
Brampton ON L6Z 4N7
Phone: (905) 495-4695
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 661 Martin St
Maplehurst Correctional Facility
Milton ON L9T 8Z1
Phone: (905)8788141
Fax: (9050878-1435
Address: 185 Ontario St S
Allendale LTC
Milton ON L9T 2M4
Phone: 9058256000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathan Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wong (CPSO#: 80708 )
Business Address: Halton Healthcare
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Healthcare
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10260 Kennedy Rd
Woodhall Park Care Community
Brampton ON L6Z 4N7
Phone: (905) 495-4695
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 661 Martin St
Maplehurst Correctional Facility
Milton ON L9T 8Z1
Phone: (905)8788141
Fax: (9050878-1435
Address: 185 Ontario St S
Allendale LTC
Milton ON L9T 2M4
Phone: 9058256000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathan Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wong (CPSO#: 80708 )
Business Address: Halton Healthcare
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN DOAN-KUEN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN DOAN-KUEN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004