THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:05:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 King St N
MSK Centre
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 603-0662
Fax: (519) 603-0518
Address: 2135 32 Avenue Northeast
Acumen Clinic
Unit 16
Calgary Alberta T2E 6Z3
Phone: 7788084614
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5126 126 Ave SE
Acumen Clinic
Calgary AB T2Z 0H2
Phone: 5875995345
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-1402 8 Ave NW
Canadian Surgery Solutions
Suite 300A
Calgary AB T2N 1B9
Phone: 18888884250
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 120-1016 68 Ave SW
Rockyview Surgical Centre
Unit 120
Calgary AB T2V 4J2
Phone: 403-252-0220
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 830 Dixon Road
Clearpoint Surgical Toronto
Toronto Ontario M9W 5Z5
Phone: 4165725972
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew G. Snider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Snider (CPSO#: 80724 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 King St N
MSK Centre
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 603-0662
Fax: (519) 603-0518
Address: 2135 32 Avenue Northeast
Acumen Clinic
Unit 16
Calgary Alberta T2E 6Z3
Phone: 7788084614
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5126 126 Ave SE
Acumen Clinic
Calgary AB T2Z 0H2
Phone: 5875995345
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-1402 8 Ave NW
Canadian Surgery Solutions
Suite 300A
Calgary AB T2N 1B9
Phone: 18888884250
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 120-1016 68 Ave SW
Rockyview Surgical Centre
Unit 120
Calgary AB T2V 4J2
Phone: 403-252-0220
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 830 Dixon Road
Clearpoint Surgical Toronto
Toronto Ontario M9W 5Z5
Phone: 4165725972
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew G. Snider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Snider (CPSO#: 80724 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW GLENISON SNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW GLENISON SNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004