THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/04/25 23:34:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Victoria Hospital
A2 337
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8385
Fax: (519) 685-8429

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sultan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sultan (CPSO#: 80725 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Room A2-337
London Ontario N6A 5W9
5196858385

Corporation Name: Sultan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Victoria Hospital
A2 337
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8385
Fax: (519) 685-8429

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sultan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sultan (CPSO#: 80725 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Room A2-337
London Ontario N6A 5W9
5196858385

Corporation Name: Sultan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABIL MOHAMED SULTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULTAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABIL MOHAMED SULTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULTAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004